31/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5241 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25091 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
02/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/10/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25091 |
|
|
10/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|