Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 646 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6430 Week
» 27819 Month
» 147346 Year
» 3174199 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5233 |
19/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25083 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
19/12/1963 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/1984 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/12/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
24/04/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
24/04/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5233 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
24/04/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25083 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
03/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
01/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25083 |
|
|