Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3551 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30730 Week
» 21786 Month
» 368210 Year
» 3395063 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5228 |
13/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25078 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
04/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1978 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1978 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
cX |
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
13/09/1963 |
Power Unit VA731 |
|
|
|
13/09/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21187 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5228 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25078 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
23/09/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25078 |
|
|
05/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|