Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 64 Today
» 4309 Yesterday
» 22176 Week
» 75192 Month
» 194719 Year
» 3221572 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5222 |
17/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25072 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
17/09/1963 to Cricklewood East (14A) |
Withdrawn |
05/12/1985 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
by 02/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
cX |
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5222 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25072 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25072 |
|
|