Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 727 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19638 Week
» 84592 Month
» 287256 Year
» 3314109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5218 |
02/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25068 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5218 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25068 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
03/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/07/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25068 |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|