Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 694 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6478 Week
» 27867 Month
» 147394 Year
» 3174247 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5217 |
02/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25067 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
02/08/1963 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
12/12/1982 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1985 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5217 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25067 |
|
|
12/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25067 |
|
|
05/1985 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|