Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 593 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6377 Week
» 27766 Month
» 147293 Year
» 3174146 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5209 |
21/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25059 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
21/06/1963 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
20/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
11/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
cX |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
22/03/2011 |
Link |
www.kwvr.co.uk |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5209 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25059 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
20/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25059 |
|
|