Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 553 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6337 Week
» 27726 Month
» 147253 Year
» 3174106 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5185 |
22/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25035 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
22/05/1963 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
15/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
22/05/1963 |
Power Unit VA711 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5185 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
04/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
15/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25035 |
|
|
15/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25035 |
|
|