Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3075 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29109 Week
» 127754 Month
» 330418 Year
» 3357271 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5182 |
19/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25032 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
05/12/1970 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
08/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
19/03/1963 |
Power Unit VA701 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5182 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25032 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
08/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25032 |
|
|
12/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|