Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 968 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18771 Week
» 71787 Month
» 191314 Year
» 3218167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5181 |
m/e |
03/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/08/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/08/1962 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Works) |
In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5181 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
24/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5181 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|