Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5177 |
04/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25027 |
12/10/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1969 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1969 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
04/02/1963 |
Power Unit VA537 |
|
|
|
04/02/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21049 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5177 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
17/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
16/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
12/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25027 |
|
|
08/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25027 |
|
|
09/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|