Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 203 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18006 Week
» 71022 Month
» 190549 Year
» 3217402 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5174 |
m/e |
12/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/11/1961 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5174 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
14/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5174 |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|