|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. | SLS/194604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/11/1930 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5161 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Leamington (LMTN) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (83G) | ||
14/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leamington (84D) | ||
25/04/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5161 | ||
15/06/1957 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stafford Road, Wolverhampton |