Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19170 Week
» 72186 Month
» 191713 Year
» 3218566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5152 |
on |
26/02/1930 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84C |
Banbury |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
84A |
Stafford Road |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
85A |
Worcester |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
26/02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5152 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
20/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5152 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|