Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4247 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17653 Week
» 70669 Month
» 190196 Year
» 3217049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5147 |
17/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24147 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
17/12/1960 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
18/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
11/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
17/12/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5147 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24147 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
18/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24147 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|