|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 12/11/1941 | 07/01/1942 | 57 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2766 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
132443 | |
Swindon Works | 10/12/1943 | 29/01/1944 | 51 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2399 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
235138 | |
Swindon Works | 11/12/1944 | 17/01/1945 | 38 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/09/1945 | 12/10/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
312428 | |
Swindon Works | 24/04/1947 | 30/05/1947 | 37 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2848 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
393142 | |
Swindon Works | 02/03/1949 | 31/03/1949 | 30 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2881 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
477697 | |
Swindon Works | 06/04/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 9 days | Unclassified | Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 17/11/1950 | 22/12/1950 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4050 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
558205 | |
Swindon Works | 22/04/1952 | 29/05/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4101 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
631340 | |
Swindon Works | 01/02/1954 | 09/03/1954 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
735516 | |
Swindon Works | 15/09/1955 | 25/10/1955 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2855 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
808739 | |
Swindon Works | 06/04/1957 | 25/10/1957 | 203 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB) |
907282 | |
Swindon Works | 07/05/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 58 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2825 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1006200 | |
Swindon Works | 16/03/1962 | 28/05/1962 | 74 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 4014 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1120121 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48. No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear. |
SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902. |
SLS/194906 |
30/12/1962 | Western Regionboundary changes | The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4069, name: WESTMINSTER ABBEY Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2923 |
||
01/11/1939 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6678 boiler fitted | ||
01/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
01/11/1939 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5089 | ||
01/11/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2801 | ||
12/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1941. Dep: 07/01/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2766 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2399 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1944. Dep: 17/01/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1945. Dep: 12/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1947. Dep: 30/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2848 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) | ||
07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
07/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
02/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/03/1949. Dep: 31/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2881 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
06/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
18/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
17/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/11/1950. Dep: 22/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4050 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 29/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4101 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/11/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4053 | ||
01/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4101 | ||
30/01/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2704 | ||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 09/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
15/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/09/1955. Dep: 25/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2855 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
06/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1957. Dep: 25/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB) |
||
28/10/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2764 | ||
20/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2825 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1962. Dep: 28/05/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 4014 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
07/1964 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2859 | ||
14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5089 from Oxley (2B) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |