Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 399 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6183 Week
» 27572 Month
» 147099 Year
» 3173952 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5061 |
15/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24061 |
05/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
TDB968007 |
07/1976 |
|
Departmental (Dept 97) |
97201 |
18/08/1979 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
15/01/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/1975 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
15/01/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
21/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
28/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5061 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
13/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24061 |
|
|
01/08/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24061 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to TDB968007 |
|
|
18/08/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97201 |
|
|