Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 739 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14782 Week
» 79736 Month
» 282400 Year
» 3309253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5004 |
22/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24004 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
22/12/1958 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
30/04/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
22/12/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/10/1963 |
A/RC/1 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
£324/-/- |
|
£324/-/- |
16/05/1964 |
A/RC/4 |
Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
|
£308/5/9 |
|
£308/6/9 |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5004 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
28/10/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
16/05/1964 |
Modification |
Modification: Modifications to Stone Vapor generators |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24004 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24004 |
|
|
30/04/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|