05/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5000 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) (Paper transfer - cont'd on loan to SR) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
17/01/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/10/1969 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24005 |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24005 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
30/04/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|