Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 712 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 712 Week
» 54166 Month
» 400590 Year
» 3427443 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4959 |
m/e |
09/1929 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
254 |
To Service |
During 09/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/12/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4959, name: PURLEY HALL Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4959 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|