30/04/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. |
SLS/194706 |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. |
SLS/194712 |
31/08/1948 |
Swindon Works |
New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 |
SLS/194810 |
31/12/1948 |
Swindon Works |
New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. |
SLS/194902 |
04/03/1962 |
Swindon Works ('A' Shop) |
Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. |
SLS/196204 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |