Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 585 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 9529 Week
» 585 Month
» 347009 Year
» 3373862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4820 |
on |
02/11/1933 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1420 |
on |
16/11/1946 (at Cardiff Cathays) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Fri 02/11/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/11/1964 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
30/04/1962 |
Leominster MPD |
Leominster shed, sub to Shrewsbury, was closed from 30th April and engines and duties (Kington goods and Leominster pilot) transferred to Hereford-its former parent shed. Since January, 1961, when it came under Shrewsbury, Hereford has still supplied engines and in February, 1962, 1420/47 were allocated to Leominster permanently and remained until closure. Now both are booked to run light engine from Hereford and return thereto in the even-ing. |
SLS/196206 |
17/10/1965 |
Final GWR Cavalcade |
A Final GWR Cavalcade BIRMINGHAM-BRISTOL On Sunday, 17th October, it is proposed to run a special train from Birmingham to Worcester and Bristol utlising a 66XX Birmingham to Worcester, the two Dartington Trust Ashburton branch locomotives 1420 an 6435 from Worcester to Bristol and 7029 Clun Castle Bristol to Birmingham; this will be the final main line run of 1420 and 6435 before their sojourn on the Ashburton branch and it is expected that Clun Castle will be withdrawn after 20th November. |
SLS/196509 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4820 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
20/04/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
18/05/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
16/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1420 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
06/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1420 |
|
|