Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17806 Week
» 70822 Month
» 190349 Year
» 3217202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6254 |
on |
17/09/1946 |
British Railways |
46254 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
Coronation (Semi) |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 17/09/1946 to Camden (1B) |
Building Cost |
£15,460.00 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/09/1964 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1947 |
General |
No. 6135 (8A), now rebuilt with taper boiler, has been fitted with plaques of the regimental crest of the East Lancashire Regiment - the plaques were presented at a ceremony at Preston on 28/6/47. Two replicas of the City crest have been presented by the City of Stoke-on-Trent to be carried by No. 6254, which is named after the city. |
SLS/194709 |
11/05/1948 |
Royal Trains |
The ex L.N.E.R. Royal Train was used for the journeys of T.M. The King and Queen from Euston to Birmingham and back on 11/5. The engine was No. M5606 (1B). On 13/5 No. 6254 (1B) worked the ex L.M.S. Royal Train from Euston en route to Ballater |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6254, name: CITY OF STOKE-ON-TRENT Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46254 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46254 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|