|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Crewe Works | During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
12/08/1964 | Crewe North MPD (In Store) | Ex Works: D239, 41272, 70006. In Store: 71000. 44218, 45567, 46225/48/51carrying yellow stripe on cab sides. | SLS/196409 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6251, name: CITY OF NOTTINGHAM Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46251 | ||
26/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
10/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
27/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
09/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
23/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
21/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
21/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
08/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
05/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
20/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46251 | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |