Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2066 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19869 Week
» 72885 Month
» 192412 Year
» 3219265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6233 |
on |
18/07/1938 |
British Railways |
46233 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
Coronation (Semi) |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 18/07/1938 to Camden (1B) |
Building Cost |
£10,659.00 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/02/1964 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
30/06/2011 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1946 |
Crewe - Destreamlined |
Starting with 6235, 4-6-2 locomotives are being destreamlined, whilst all streamlined tenders are having the streamlining removed. |
SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 |
Crewe - Smoke deflectors |
Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. |
SLS/194605 |
30/06/1950 |
The \"Bon Accord\" |
The 'Bon Accord' (1.35 p.m. ex Buchanan Street) has frequently been worked by a 'Pacific' since the introduction of the Summer Timetable. Nos. 46206, 46229, 46233, 46235 have been noted. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/07/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6233, name: DUCHESS OF SUTHERLAND Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46233 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46233 |
|
|