31/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Further Class '5' 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4761 (25/9), 4762 (2/10) and 4763 (9/10). Work has not yet started on the next 'Royal Scot' conversion (No. 6162), but the next two 'Patriot' rebuilds (Nos. 5540 and 5531) are receiving attention; the former will be completed by the end of October. Two further Class '7' 4-6-2's have had the streamline casing removed, viz.: Nos. 6228 (w/e 27/9) and 6245 (w/e 4/10), thus leaving only four streamlined 'Pacifics' on the L.M.S.: Nos. 6226, 6229, 6236 an 6243. The number of withdrawn locos. lying in the Works has been further reduced. The following engines have been cut up since 20/9: Nos. 6748 (w/e 12/10), 6650 (w/e 27/9), 6685 (w/e 27/9), 6704 (w/e 11/10), 6660 (w/e 4/10) and 25841 (w/e 4/10). The conversion of '8F' 2-8-0 No. 8653 to oil-burning was completed on 14/10 and No. 8606 will be similarly dealt with. 'Patriot' Class: No. 5518 now has the nameplates Bradshaw uncovered. 'Royal Scot' Class: No. 6144 has had its name restored after running without it continuously since well before the war. |
SLS/194711 |
13/12/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Another 'Pacific' has had the streamline casing removed, viz.: No. 6229, during the w/e 13/12/47; No. 6236 will probably be the next to be dealt with. |
SLS/194801 |
29/02/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The first two engines of Order E 468, Nos. 4748 and 4749 , were completed on 15/1 and 6/2 respectively. They are the first of ten engines to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear together with roller-bearing axle-boxes. The appearance of these engines differs somewhat from that of the previous Class '5' 4-6-0's, the most outstanding features being a lowered foot-framing, involving the use of splashers over the coupled wheels, and the main steam pipes, which, set well forward, are coupled to the front end of each steam chest. The camshaft is driven from a gearbox mounted on the leading coupled axle, between the frames. This is connected, by means of a universal shaft, to the cross-driving gearbox, which, situated beneath the smokebox saddle, imparts rotary motion direct to the camshaft. A small instruction plate inside the cab advises drivers to work the engine with a fully-open regulator varying the cut-off to suit gradients, etc. No. 4748 underwent trials on 4/2. One more Class '7P' 4-6-2 has had the streamline casing removed, this was No. *6236 during w/e 7/2 (*This now leaves only two (Nos. 6226/43) to be dealt with). No. 6229, which had the, streamline casing removed in 12/47, went into traffic early in January, in standard .L.M.S. livery, but with a blank tender side. Since then, however, all newly-painted locomotives have had 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' painted on the tender side and the prefix 'M' added, above the number on the cab side, and also beside the number on the smokebox door. All numerals and letters are in a new Gill Sans style, unlined. Several locomotives have already been experimentally painted in various colours. Among these were L.M.S. Class '5' 4-6-0's Nos. 4762-4 and 5292 , painted S.R. green, L.N.E.R. green, G.W.R. green, and black respectively. All four engines were lined on the left-hand side only, the lining on each engine being standard with that used by the pre-nationalised company represented. The style of lining applied to No. 5292 is reminiscent of L. & N.W.R. livery; this engine has since returned to Works, and has been lined on the right-hand side also. These four locomotives were noted at Crewe on the evening of 28/1, apparently just off Works, but they have since been seen in regular service. The number of withdrawn locomotives standing, in the Works' yard has been further reduced. Engines recently cut up include Nos. 9206, 25694, 28343 W/E 17/1, and Nos. 9374, 28546/50 , W/E 24/1 |
SLS/194803 |
31/01/1949 |
Crewe Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand. Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox. Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides. Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three. |
SLS/194903 |
30/06/1950 |
The \"Bon Accord\" |
The 'Bon Accord' (1.35 p.m. ex Buchanan Street) has frequently been worked by a 'Pacific' since the introduction of the Summer Timetable. Nos. 46206, 46229, 46233, 46235 have been noted. |
SLS/195008 |
04/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. |
SLS/196107 |