|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 07/07/1936 | 28/07/1936 | 22 days | Heavy Service | Tender number 9354 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 30/10/1936 | 18/11/1936 | 20 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 09/02/1937 | 22/02/1937 | 14 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 24/05/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 41 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 21/10/1937 | 20/11/1937 | 31 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 16/04/1938 | 26/05/1938 | 41 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 23/09/1938 | 21/10/1938 | 29 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 24/07/1939 | 30/08/1939 | 38 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 07/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 23 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 19/04/1941 | 17/05/1941 | 29 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 29/09/1941 | 17/10/1941 | 19 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 03/02/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 26 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 18/07/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 23/11/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 27 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 04/06/1943 | 13/07/1943 | 40 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 23/12/1943 | 26/01/1944 | 35 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 23/10/1944 | 09/11/1944 | 18 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 11/12/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 13 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 16/01/1945 | 01/03/1945 | 45 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 08/10/1945 | 17/01/1946 | 102 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 15/04/1946 | 12/06/1946 | 59 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 30/06/1947 | 25/09/1947 | 88 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 10/03/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 32 days | Light Ordinary | Renumbered to BR 46212 |
||
Crewe Works | 08/11/1948 | 20/04/1949 | 164 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 31/05/1949 | 07/06/1949 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 18/07/1949 | 10/08/1949 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 01/11/1949 | 10/12/1949 | 40 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 06/02/1950 | 20/03/1950 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 27/03/1950 | 20/04/1950 | 25 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 31/01/1951 | 28/02/1951 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 10/05/1951 | 05/06/1951 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 11/11/1951 | 11/12/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 09/02/1952 | 12/03/1952 | 33 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 25/09/1952 | 26/11/1952 | 63 days | Heavy General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 08/01/1953 | 17/01/1953 | 10 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 01/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 12 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 20/04/1953 | 16/06/1953 | 58 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/06/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 11 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 01/01/1954 | 25/02/1954 | 56 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 04/06/1954 | 01/07/1954 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 03/10/1955 | 18/11/1955 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 06/03/1956 | 10/04/1956 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 05/06/1956 | 02/07/1956 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 04/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 07/09/1957 | 12/09/1957 | 6 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 06/10/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 05/02/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 01/09/1958 | 12/11/1958 | 73 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 14/11/1958 | 20/11/1958 | 7 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 05/04/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 60 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 12/11/1959 | 19/01/1960 | 69 days | Heavy General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
08/04/1962 | Crewe Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. | SLS/196205 |
04/05/1962 | Princess Royals Scrapped | Princess Royal Class 46204/7/10/1/2 were cut up week ending (4/5) | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6212, name: DUCHESS OF KENT Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: LMS lined red Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted |
||
07/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 07/07/1936. Dep: 28/07/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 9354 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
30/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 30/10/1936. Dep: 18/11/1936. | ||
09/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 09/02/1937. Dep: 22/02/1937. | ||
24/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/05/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. | ||
21/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 21/10/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937. | ||
16/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 16/04/1938. Dep: 26/05/1938. | ||
23/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 23/09/1938. Dep: 21/10/1938. | ||
24/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/07/1939. Dep: 30/08/1939. | ||
16/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
21/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
07/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 07/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. | ||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941. | ||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 17/10/1941. | ||
03/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 03/02/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. | ||
18/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 18/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. | ||
23/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 23/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. | ||
22/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/06/1943. Dep: 13/07/1943. | ||
23/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 23/12/1943. Dep: 26/01/1944. | ||
23/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 09/11/1944. | ||
05/12/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9345 | ||
11/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 11/12/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
16/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 16/01/1945. Dep: 01/03/1945. | ||
08/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/10/1945. Dep: 17/01/1946. | ||
15/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 15/04/1946. Dep: 12/06/1946. | ||
30/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 30/06/1947. Dep: 25/09/1947. | ||
10/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 10/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 46212 |
||
08/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 20/04/1949. | ||
31/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 07/06/1949. | ||
18/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 10/08/1949. | ||
01/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949. | ||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 20/03/1950. | ||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 20/04/1950. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
31/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1951. Dep: 28/02/1951. | ||
10/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 05/06/1951. | ||
11/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1951. Dep: 11/12/1951. | ||
09/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 09/02/1952. Dep: 12/03/1952. | ||
25/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/09/1952. Dep: 26/11/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
11/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 17/01/1953. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
01/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 01/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 16/06/1953. | ||
17/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 17/06/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. | ||
01/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/01/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954. | ||
04/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1954. Dep: 01/07/1954. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 18/11/1955. | ||
28/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
06/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1956. Dep: 10/04/1956. | ||
10/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
05/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1956. Dep: 02/07/1956. | ||
04/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. | ||
07/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 07/09/1957. Dep: 12/09/1957. | ||
05/10/1957 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
06/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. | ||
05/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. | ||
01/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 12/11/1958. | ||
14/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 14/11/1958. Dep: 20/11/1958. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
05/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. | ||
13/06/1959 | Modification | Modification: Speedometer fitted | ||
12/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/11/1959. Dep: 19/01/1960. | ||
07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46212 from Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |