|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 04/09/1936 | 25/09/1936 | 22 days | Light Service | Tender number 9360 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 11/01/1937 | 10/02/1937 | 31 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 17/06/1937 | 28/07/1937 | 42 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 26/03/1938 | 28/06/1938 | 95 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 10/07/1939 | 27/07/1939 | 18 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 16/12/1939 | 06/01/1940 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | Tender number 9376 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 17/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 27 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 07/11/1940 | 19/12/1940 | 43 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 09/05/1941 | 28/05/1941 | 20 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 31/07/1941 | 22/08/1941 | 23 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 20/12/1941 | 29/01/1942 | 41 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 30/07/1942 | 07/10/1942 | 70 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 11/02/1943 | 10/03/1943 | 28 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 04/09/1943 | 21/10/1943 | 48 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 15/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 26 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 19/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 36 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 28/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 32 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 20/08/1946 | 24/09/1946 | 36 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 04/07/1947 | 28/08/1947 | 56 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 18/09/1947 | 29/10/1947 | 42 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 03/11/1947 | 21/11/1947 | 19 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 22/04/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 45 days | Light Ordinary | Renumbered to BR 46210 |
||
Crewe Works | 10/06/1948 | 14/06/1948 | 5 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 21/02/1949 | 21/03/1949 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 15/08/1949 | 12/10/1949 | 59 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 27/03/1950 | 26/05/1950 | 61 days | Heavy General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 01/12/1950 | 13/01/1951 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 12/05/1951 | 15/06/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 08/09/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 14/05/1952 | 24/06/1952 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 21/08/1952 | 13/09/1952 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 29/12/1952 | 07/03/1953 | 69 days | Heavy General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 06/11/1953 | 11/12/1953 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 25/05/1954 | 29/07/1954 | 66 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 04/08/1955 | 13/08/1955 | 10 days | Light Casual | Tender number 9372 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 03/11/1955 | 06/01/1956 | 65 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 26/11/1956 | 04/01/1957 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 16/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 40 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 25/09/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 4 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 13/02/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 45 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 13/04/1958 | 07/06/1958 | 56 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 24/08/1959 | 24/10/1959 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 20/08/1960 | 19/11/1960 | 92 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/07/1950 | Derby Works | Observations (22/6) U.T.A. 54 ready for despatch, 55 completed, 56 and 57 under construction. (29/6) 56 completed. (6/7) 57 almost finished. New 2-6-4T 42145 in paint shop (22/6): 42146 almost ready (6/7). Diesel-electric shunters 12069/70 complete on 22/6, 12071 to follow. Being cut up (22/6) 727, 41039, 3173: already cut up 58041, 58082. In store near station 404, 40411, 40416, 43364 (22/6 to 6/7). Repainted with emblem: 43861, 44313, 58127, 12035, 44050, 47282, 44338, 43310, 47207, 44132, 44558, 47672, 44179, 58293, 43356; also with lining 42348, 42350, 40053, 40694, 41063, 42399, 40931, 41064. Off works: 40631 (plain tender); lettered L.M.S., 43490, 43575, 44559, 41079, 41100, 42341, 43203, 43267, 44241, 44559, 58070, 44174, 40060, 40063, 41016, 43399, 58189 (tender cab). Lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS: 44030, 40055, 41074 (tall chimney); also with lining 42304, 40055. In works yard (22/6-6/7): 40556, 58036, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 22853. 10800 was on trial, on 22/6 with dynamometer car and six bogies, and a week later on test run with dynamometer car and five bogies-Derby-Leicester-Manchester-Derby. The first set of frames for No. 1 of Order 4310 (? 2-6-0) were set up early' in July. 46100 is now 'Taper Scot' green livery, with smoke deflectors, number on smokebox door, no bell, and the large nameplates which were put on the old engine after her return from U.S.A. (These are not correct for the engine as it is now). 46210 is the first of its class to be painted blue, and is in traffic. 58394 (ex 28509) has come off works and so escaped the melting-pot for a time. |
SLS/195008 |
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
08/04/1962 | Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works on 5B: 12009/19, 42677/8, 43681, 44364, 45418, 46144/9, 46205/7/10, 47213, 47547, 48964, 49158, 70016. Ex Works on 5B: 45116, 45225, 46117, 48732. | SLS/196205 |
04/05/1962 | Princess Royals Scrapped | Princess Royal Class 46204/7/10/1/2 were cut up week ending (4/5) | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/09/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6210, name: LADY PATRICIA Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: LMS lined red Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted |
||
04/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 04/09/1936. Dep: 25/09/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 9360 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
11/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 11/01/1937. Dep: 10/02/1937. | ||
17/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 17/06/1937. Dep: 28/07/1937. | ||
26/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 28/06/1938. | ||
16/06/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9353 | ||
10/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 10/07/1939. Dep: 27/07/1939. | ||
16/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 9376 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
17/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 17/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. | ||
07/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 19/12/1940. | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 28/05/1941. | ||
31/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 31/07/1941. Dep: 22/08/1941. | ||
20/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 20/12/1941. Dep: 29/01/1942. | ||
30/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 30/07/1942. Dep: 07/10/1942. | ||
11/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 11/02/1943. Dep: 10/03/1943. | ||
22/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 21/10/1943. | ||
15/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 15/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. | ||
28/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 28/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
20/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 20/08/1946. Dep: 24/09/1946. | ||
04/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947. | ||
18/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 18/09/1947. Dep: 29/10/1947. | ||
03/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 03/11/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
22/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 22/04/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 46210 |
||
10/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 14/06/1948. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
21/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/02/1949. Dep: 21/03/1949. | ||
15/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949. | ||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
01/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951. | ||
12/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1951. Dep: 15/06/1951. | ||
08/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. | ||
14/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1952. Dep: 24/06/1952. | ||
21/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1952. Dep: 13/09/1952. | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
06/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1953. Dep: 11/12/1953. | ||
25/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1954. Dep: 29/07/1954. | ||
04/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 9372 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
03/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/11/1955. Dep: 06/01/1956. | ||
04/02/1956 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
15/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
26/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1956. Dep: 04/01/1957. | ||
16/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. | ||
25/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 25/09/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. | ||
05/10/1957 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
13/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. | ||
13/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 13/04/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
06/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) | ||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 24/10/1959. | ||
20/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. | ||
04/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46210 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |