|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 12/12/1935 | 16/01/1936 | 36 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 14/09/1936 | 01/10/1936 | 18 days | Light Service | Tender number 9361 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 11/02/1937 | 24/03/1937 | 42 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 06/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 24 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 15/10/1938 | 21/11/1938 | 38 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 02/08/1939 | 25/08/1939 | 24 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 26/03/1940 | 09/04/1940 | 15 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 21/10/1940 | 11/11/1940 | 22 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 08/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 21/07/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 27 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 23/02/1942 | 14/03/1942 | 20 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 29/05/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 23 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 14/12/1942 | 19/01/1943 | 37 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 08/03/1943 | 12/04/1943 | 36 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 27/09/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 69 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 28/12/1944 | 03/02/1945 | 38 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 01/10/1945 | 21/12/1945 | 82 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 07/08/1946 | 25/10/1946 | 80 days | Heavy Ordinary | Tender number 9354 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 05/02/1947 | 26/03/1947 | 50 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 01/07/1947 | 05/09/1947 | 67 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 09/12/1947 | 09/01/1948 | 32 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 16/10/1948 | 18/01/1949 | 95 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 13/06/1949 | 15/08/1949 | 64 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 24/11/1949 | 04/01/1950 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/04/1950 | 25/05/1950 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 16/11/1950 | 17/02/1951 | 94 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 15/08/1951 | 08/10/1951 | 55 days | Heavy General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 21/10/1951 | 09/11/1951 | 20 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 20/03/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/11/1952 | 24/12/1952 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 14/05/1953 | 25/05/1953 | 12 days | Light Casual | Shed Repair |
||
Crewe Works | 03/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 26/10/1954 | 03/12/1954 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 28/11/1955 | 18/02/1956 | 83 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 03/12/1956 | 11/01/1957 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 28/10/1957 | 11/12/1957 | 45 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 08/10/1958 | 10/12/1958 | 64 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 04/02/1959 | 22/05/1959 | 108 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 26/08/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 19/12/1960 | 10/03/1961 | 82 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1943 | Crewe Works | Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. | SLS/194401 |
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
20/06/1961 | LMSR Pacifics | 46200 an 46209 (5A) were both noted at Crewe on 20th June on passenger trains. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/08/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6209, name: PRINCESS BEATRICE Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: LMS lined red |
||
07/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
12/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 12/12/1935. Dep: 16/01/1936. | ||
14/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 14/09/1936. Dep: 01/10/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 9361 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
11/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/02/1937. Dep: 24/03/1937. | ||
06/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 06/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. | ||
12/02/1938 | Allocation | Loaned to Crewe North (5A) | ||
19/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 21/11/1938. | ||
02/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 02/08/1939. Dep: 25/08/1939. | ||
06/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
26/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 26/03/1940. Dep: 09/04/1940. | ||
21/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 21/10/1940. Dep: 11/11/1940. | ||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. | ||
21/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/07/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. | ||
23/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 23/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. | ||
02/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 29/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. | ||
14/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 14/12/1942. Dep: 19/01/1943. | ||
08/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 08/03/1943. Dep: 12/04/1943. | ||
27/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/09/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
28/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 28/12/1944. Dep: 03/02/1945. | ||
01/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/10/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945. | ||
07/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 07/08/1946. Dep: 25/10/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 9354 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 26/03/1947. | ||
01/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 01/07/1947. Dep: 05/09/1947. | ||
09/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 09/01/1948. | ||
16/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 18/01/1949. | ||
22/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46209 | ||
13/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1949. Dep: 15/08/1949. | ||
24/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1949. Dep: 04/01/1950. | ||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 25/05/1950. | ||
16/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1950. Dep: 17/02/1951. | ||
15/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/08/1951. Dep: 08/10/1951. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
21/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 21/10/1951. Dep: 09/11/1951. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
20/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952. | ||
14/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1953. Dep: 25/05/1953. Work undertaken: Shed Repair |
||
03/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. | ||
26/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1954. Dep: 03/12/1954. | ||
28/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
03/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 11/01/1957. | ||
28/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1957. Dep: 11/12/1957. | ||
28/12/1957 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
06/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
08/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 10/12/1958. | ||
04/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1959. Dep: 22/05/1959. | ||
13/06/1959 | Modification | Modification: Speedometer fitted | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
26/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. | ||
13/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
03/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
19/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1960. Dep: 10/03/1961. | ||
27/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46209 from Camden (1B) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |