|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 09/12/1935 | 13/01/1936 | 36 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 09/04/1936 | 08/05/1936 | 30 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 15/06/1936 | 24/06/1936 | 10 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 01/10/1936 | 28/10/1936 | 28 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 23/08/1937 | 06/10/1937 | 45 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 02/07/1938 | 08/08/1938 | 38 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 14/02/1939 | 21/03/1939 | 36 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 22/05/1939 | 14/06/1939 | 24 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 01/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 34 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 20/02/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 19 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 30/09/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 20 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 06/03/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 24 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 19/11/1941 | 24/01/1942 | 67 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 27/02/1942 | 23/03/1942 | 25 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 10/04/1943 | 08/06/1943 | 60 days | LG | |||
Crewe Works | 06/11/1943 | 31/12/1943 | 56 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 27/10/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 37 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 27/06/1945 | 13/09/1945 | 79 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 17/05/1946 | 17/06/1946 | 32 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 02/10/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 44 days | Heavy Service | Tender number 9353 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 19/11/1947 | 02/12/1947 | 14 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 26/02/1948 | 03/03/1948 | 7 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 24/11/1948 | 10/05/1949 | 168 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 19/05/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 05/09/1949 | 10/10/1949 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/04/1950 | 20/05/1950 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 25/12/1950 | 18/01/1951 | 25 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 20/01/1951 | 24/01/1951 | 5 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 31/01/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 21/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 3 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 23/09/1951 | 22/12/1951 | 91 days | Heavy General | Repair to severe damage sustained in accident at Weedon on 21st September, 1951 Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 26/09/1952 | 31/10/1952 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 06/11/1952 | 07/11/1952 | 2 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 08/01/1953 | 16/02/1953 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 09/11/1953 | 01/01/1954 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 09/03/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 11/12/1954 | 25/01/1955 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 21/04/1955 | 18/05/1955 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 26/10/1955 | 09/12/1955 | 45 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 20/08/1956 | 10/09/1956 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 29/03/1957 | 15/05/1957 | 48 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 25/06/1957 | 09/07/1957 | 15 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 02/11/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 8 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 08/03/1958 | 09/05/1958 | 63 days | Heavy General | Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
Crewe Works | 24/09/1958 | 24/10/1958 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/11/1958 | 05/12/1958 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/01/1959 | 14/03/1959 | 57 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 14/05/1959 | 08/07/1959 | 56 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 29/10/1960 | 03/12/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 12/01/1961 | 11/02/1961 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Crewe Works | New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
08/04/1962 | Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works on 5B: 12009/19, 42677/8, 43681, 44364, 45418, 46144/9, 46205/7/10, 47213, 47547, 48964, 49158, 70016. Ex Works on 5B: 45116, 45225, 46117, 48732. | SLS/196205 |
04/05/1962 | Princess Royals Scrapped | Princess Royal Class 46204/7/10/1/2 were cut up week ending (4/5) | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6207, name: PRINCESS ARTHUR OF CONNAUGHT Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: LMS lined red Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted |
||
31/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
09/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 09/12/1935. Dep: 13/01/1936. | ||
09/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 09/04/1936. Dep: 08/05/1936. | ||
15/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 15/06/1936. Dep: 24/06/1936. | ||
01/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 01/10/1936. Dep: 28/10/1936. | ||
18/12/1936 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9376 | ||
23/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/08/1937. Dep: 06/10/1937. | ||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 08/08/1938. | ||
04/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
27/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
14/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 14/02/1939. Dep: 21/03/1939. | ||
22/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 22/05/1939. Dep: 14/06/1939. | ||
16/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
21/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
25/12/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9353 | ||
01/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. | ||
20/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 20/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. | ||
01/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
10/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
30/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 30/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. | ||
06/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 06/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. | ||
19/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 24/01/1942. | ||
27/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 27/02/1942. Dep: 23/03/1942. | ||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | |||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 31/12/1943. | ||
27/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 27/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
27/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 27/06/1945. Dep: 13/09/1945. | ||
17/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/05/1946. Dep: 17/06/1946. | ||
20/11/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9359 | ||
02/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 02/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 9353 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
19/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 19/11/1947. Dep: 02/12/1947. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
26/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 26/02/1948. Dep: 03/03/1948. | ||
24/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/11/1948. Dep: 10/05/1949. | ||
05/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to Black (Lining: Red and White) | ||
14/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46207 | ||
19/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. | ||
05/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 10/10/1949. | ||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 20/05/1950. | ||
25/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 25/12/1950. Dep: 18/01/1951. | ||
20/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 24/01/1951. | ||
31/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. | ||
21/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 21/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
23/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/09/1951. Dep: 22/12/1951. Work undertaken: Repair to severe damage sustained in accident at Weedon on 21st September, 1951 Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
26/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952. | ||
06/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 06/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 16/02/1953. | ||
09/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1953. Dep: 01/01/1954. | ||
09/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. | ||
11/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/12/1954. Dep: 25/01/1955. | ||
21/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1955. Dep: 18/05/1955. | ||
26/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/10/1955. Dep: 09/12/1955. | ||
04/02/1956 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
25/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
20/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1956. Dep: 10/09/1956. | ||
29/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/03/1957. Dep: 15/05/1957. | ||
25/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 25/06/1957. Dep: 09/07/1957. | ||
02/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 02/11/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. | ||
30/11/1957 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. Work undertaken: Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
05/1958 | Livery | Change of livery to Standard BR red for steam locomotives | ||
24/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1958. Dep: 24/10/1958. | ||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958. | ||
17/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1959. Dep: 14/03/1959. | ||
21/03/1959 | Modification | Modification: Speedometer fitted | ||
14/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1959. Dep: 08/07/1959. | ||
03/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
29/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960. | ||
12/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1961. Dep: 11/02/1961. | ||
11/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
15/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
09/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
25/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46207 from Willesden (1A) | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |