|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 23/12/1935 | 24/12/1935 | 2 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 17/04/1936 | 06/05/1936 | 20 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 08/06/1936 | 17/06/1936 | 10 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 07/08/1936 | 21/08/1936 | 15 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 11/12/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 9 days | Light Ordinary | Tender number 9375 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 28/09/1937 | 15/11/1937 | 49 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 21/06/1938 | 03/08/1938 | 44 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 06/12/1938 | 22/12/1938 | 17 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 15/08/1939 | 06/09/1939 | 23 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 02/09/1940 | 09/10/1940 | 38 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 09/10/1941 | 31/10/1941 | 23 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 02/07/1942 | 05/08/1942 | 35 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 08/04/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 24 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 20/11/1943 | 22/12/1943 | 33 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 13/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 29 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 31/01/1945 | 09/03/1945 | 38 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 27/05/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 21 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 22/11/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 45 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 05/09/1946 | 11/10/1946 | 37 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 27/01/1947 | 15/04/1947 | 79 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 02/09/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 44 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 18/10/1947 | 17/11/1947 | 31 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 20/11/1947 | 11/12/1947 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 09/03/1948 | 21/04/1948 | 44 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 03/05/1948 | 20/05/1948 | 18 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 30/12/1948 | 10/03/1949 | 71 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 24/03/1949 | 04/04/1949 | 12 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 11/05/1949 | 02/06/1949 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 27/06/1949 | 28/09/1949 | 94 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 22/10/1949 | 09/11/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 15/04/1950 | 13/09/1950 | 152 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 15/03/1951 | 17/04/1951 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 23/04/1951 | 02/05/1951 | 10 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 19/06/1951 | 04/08/1951 | 47 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 08/08/1951 | 23/08/1951 | 16 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 11/09/1951 | 16/10/1951 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 01/11/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 12/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 28/02/1952 | 26/06/1952 | 120 days | Heavy General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 09/01/1953 | 13/02/1953 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 24/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 13/09/1954 | 08/11/1954 | 57 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 29/03/1955 | 16/04/1955 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 20/05/1955 | 07/07/1955 | 49 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 03/10/1955 | 27/10/1955 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/11/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 28/12/1955 | 19/01/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 25/02/1956 | 19/04/1956 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 04/06/1956 | 26/06/1956 | 23 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 28/01/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 34 days | IH | |||
Crewe Works | 21/08/1957 | 10/10/1957 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 04/07/1958 | 29/08/1958 | 57 days | Light Intermediate | Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
Crewe Works | 15/11/1958 | 10/01/1959 | 57 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 29/04/1959 | 12/06/1959 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 29/09/1959 | 27/11/1959 | 60 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 24/03/1960 | 17/05/1960 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 02/12/1960 | 19/11/1960 | -12 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Crewe Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand. Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox. Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides. Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three. |
SLS/194903 |
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
08/04/1962 | Crewe Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. | SLS/196205 |
04/05/1962 | Princess Royals Scrapped | Princess Royal Class 46204/7/10/1/2 were cut up week ending (4/5) | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/07/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6204, name: PRINCESS LOUISE Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: LMS lined red Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted |
||
23/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 23/12/1935. Dep: 24/12/1935. | ||
24/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (27A) | ||
29/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
17/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 17/04/1936. Dep: 06/05/1936. | ||
08/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 08/06/1936. Dep: 17/06/1936. | ||
07/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 07/08/1936. Dep: 21/08/1936. | ||
11/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 11/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 9375 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
28/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/09/1937. Dep: 15/11/1937. | ||
21/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 21/06/1938. Dep: 03/08/1938. | ||
06/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 06/12/1938. Dep: 22/12/1938. | ||
15/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 15/08/1939. Dep: 06/09/1939. | ||
16/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
21/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
06/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
02/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/09/1940. Dep: 09/10/1940. | ||
09/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
09/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 09/10/1941. Dep: 31/10/1941. | ||
21/03/1942 | Allocation | Loaned to Camden (1B) | ||
16/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
02/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 02/07/1942. Dep: 05/08/1942. | ||
17/10/1942 | Allocation | Loaned to Camden (1B) | ||
08/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. | ||
27/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
20/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 22/12/1943. | ||
13/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. | ||
20/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
31/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 31/01/1945. Dep: 09/03/1945. | ||
24/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
27/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 27/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. | ||
22/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 22/11/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. | ||
05/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/09/1946. Dep: 11/10/1946. | ||
27/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 27/01/1947. Dep: 15/04/1947. | ||
02/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 02/09/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 17/11/1947. | ||
20/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 20/11/1947. Dep: 11/12/1947. | ||
09/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 21/04/1948. | ||
24/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46204 | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 20/05/1948. | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
30/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1948. Dep: 10/03/1949. | ||
24/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 24/03/1949. Dep: 04/04/1949. | ||
11/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1949. Dep: 02/06/1949. | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
27/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1949. Dep: 28/09/1949. | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
22/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949. | ||
15/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/04/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950. | ||
10/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
15/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951. | ||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 02/05/1951. | ||
19/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. | ||
08/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 08/08/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951. | ||
11/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1951. Dep: 16/10/1951. | ||
01/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. | ||
12/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. | ||
28/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/02/1952. Dep: 26/06/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1953. Dep: 13/02/1953. | ||
24/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. | ||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 08/11/1954. | ||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955. | ||
20/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 07/07/1955. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 27/10/1955. | ||
17/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. | ||
28/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1955. Dep: 19/01/1956. | ||
25/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 19/04/1956. | ||
04/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 04/06/1956. Dep: 26/06/1956. | ||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | |||
22/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
21/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 10/10/1957. | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/07/1958. Dep: 29/08/1958. Work undertaken: Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
05/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
08/1958 | Livery | Change of livery to Standard BR red for steam locomotives | ||
15/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1958. Dep: 10/01/1959. | ||
29/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1959. Dep: 12/06/1959. | ||
13/06/1959 | Modification | Modification: Speedometer fitted | ||
29/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1959. Dep: 27/11/1959. | ||
24/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1960. Dep: 17/05/1960. | ||
02/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. | ||
07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46204 from Edge Hill (8A) | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |