Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2358 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15764 Week
» 68780 Month
» 188307 Year
» 3215160 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6162 |
on |
09/09/1930 |
British Railways |
46162 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
7P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 09/09/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/05/1964 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Further Class '5' 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4761 (25/9), 4762 (2/10) and 4763 (9/10). Work has not yet started on the next 'Royal Scot' conversion (No. 6162), but the next two 'Patriot' rebuilds (Nos. 5540 and 5531) are receiving attention; the former will be completed by the end of October. Two further Class '7' 4-6-2's have had the streamline casing removed, viz.: Nos. 6228 (w/e 27/9) and 6245 (w/e 4/10), thus leaving only four streamlined 'Pacifics' on the L.M.S.: Nos. 6226, 6229, 6236 an 6243. The number of withdrawn locos. lying in the Works has been further reduced. The following engines have been cut up since 20/9: Nos. 6748 (w/e 12/10), 6650 (w/e 27/9), 6685 (w/e 27/9), 6704 (w/e 11/10), 6660 (w/e 4/10) and 25841 (w/e 4/10). The conversion of '8F' 2-8-0 No. 8653 to oil-burning was completed on 14/10 and No. 8606 will be similarly dealt with. 'Patriot' Class: No. 5518 now has the nameplates Bradshaw uncovered. 'Royal Scot' Class: No. 6144 has had its name restored after running without it continuously since well before the war. |
SLS/194711 |
21/11/1947 |
Crewe Works |
No. 5531, the latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt, was completed on 21/11/47. The rebuilding of No. 6162 is well in hand, but it is unlikely that this engine will be in traffic before the New Year. |
SLS/194801 |
31/01/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. |
SLS/194802 |
03/06/1961 |
Leeds-Birmingham-Bristol line |
With the advent of the Summer t.t. several steam workings have gone over to Type 4 Sulzers; whilst only 3 A3 Pacifics are left at Holbeck, Saltley has gained 3 class 6P and 11 Class 7P 4-6-0s viz., 45579, 45648/9, 45532/40, 46100/3/12/8/22/41/57/60/2. It is presumed that these latter will be utilised on Saturdays for the many extra trains which are run (and upon which 2-10-0s were utilised last year). |
SLS/196107 |
03/06/1962 |
Saltley MPD |
The following Royal Scots have been placed in store-46103/22/32/60 all ex Works; 46157/62; 46123 was under repair on 3rd June but was also scheduled for storage. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6162, name: QUEEN'S WESTMINSTER RIFLEMAN Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46162 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46162 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|