31/12/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
31/03/1949 |
Crewe Works |
During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 |
Mirfield Area |
February-April 1949: 'Royal Scot's' and rebuilt 'Patriot's' are now working occasionally on the Central Division. They usually appear on the 9 a.m. and 5 p.m. Liverpool (Lime Street)- Newcastle trains, returning on the 1.5 p.m. ex Leeds-Newcastle-Liverpool train and the 8.8 p.m. ex Leeds-Liverpool stopping train. Until recently, the turns appear to have been on Mondays only, when the 9 a.m. ex Liverpool is loaded to thirteen or fourteen bogies, but in the last week or two they have appeared more frequently. The following have so far been noted:-Nos. 46106/23/24/34/35/44/56/64 an 45521/26. Class '8' W.D. locomotives are also becoming prominent, a large number having arrived at Rose Grove and one or two at Millhouse, though these may have moved to Rose Grove within the last few days. Apart from several from the N.E. Area, some have been noted ex Scotland, and two-Nos. 90206 an 90713-ex store on the former G.W. Rly.; the last two having passed through Crewe Works. Most of the remaining ex L. & Y. Class '3' rebuilt 2-4-2T's are now in this area and Nos. 50891, 50909/25 are performing regular duties on local trains. |
SLS/194906 |
27/03/1954 |
Crewe Works |
On 27th March two sets of frames were ready for rebuilt Scots Nos. 46148 an 46156. The old frames of No. 46148 were in the old Erecting Shop with the name-plate still attached; No. 46137 was also there but it was not clear if she had just come in or was ready to leave, still unrebuilt. |
SLS/195405 |
08/04/1962 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop Yard) |
New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. |
SLS/196205 |