02/11/1943 |
Crewe Works |
Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. |
SLS/194401 |
27/03/1954 |
Crewe Works |
On 27th March two sets of frames were ready for rebuilt Scots Nos. 46148 an 46156. The old frames of No. 46148 were in the old Erecting Shop with the name-plate still attached; No. 46137 was also there but it was not clear if she had just come in or was ready to leave, still unrebuilt. |
SLS/195405 |
01/02/1958 |
LMR regional adjustments |
In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. |
SLS/195802 |
31/10/1959 |
Millhouses MPD |
Rebuilt Patriots 45514/36 and Royal Scots 46131/47/8/51/64 were transferred here in February and also work some previous Kentish Town diagrams. B1 61138 has gone to Canklow (41D). |
SLS/196003 |
31/12/1961 |
Millhouses closure |
Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). |
SLS/196203 |
08/04/1962 |
Crewe Works (Works Yard) |
New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. |
SLS/196205 |