|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/04/1962 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/11/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6129, name: THE SCOTTISH HORSE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
02/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46129 | ||
21/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
14/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
01/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
30/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
10/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
15/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
06/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46129 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |