31/03/1947 |
Crewe Works |
'Patriot' 5X Class engines rebuilt to date have been dealt with in the following order: Nos. 5530/21/26/14. The latter went into traffic on 26/3. The 'Princess Coronation' 4-6-2 which have had the streamline casing removed since January 1st are Nos. 6241/37/25 (in that order). Locos. to receive the new standard livery recently include: Nos. 5538, 5591, 5639, 5684, 5706, 5708, 6110, 6118, 6121, 6127, 6134, 6135, 6139, 6147, 6161, 6202 and 6211. No. 6202 has had a complete general repair and it is understood that it will only be a matter of weeks before she appears on the Western Division again. Construction of new Class 5 4-6-0's has begun again and the first engine, No. 4768 of Order No. E466 was completed on 27/3. |
SLS/194705 |
07/05/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196106 |
04/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) |
Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. |
SLS/196107 |
31/12/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. |
SLS/196202 |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Upperby MPD (Stored) |
In steam at Upperby on 17th March were 46221/35/7/8/45. Stored on same day at Upperby-46106/8/23/7/34/250; |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Cardiff (Stored) |
The E.E. Type 3s now being delivered are being sent after acceptance trials at Doncaster and not in order; D6821 was delivered l.e, via GC line 19th April, D6822 via London 24th April, staying overnight at Willesden (and sent to Cardiff 25/4); D6834/5 were delivered l.e. via GC line 24th April, and D6836 on 30th April (D7076/8 were attached to latter as far as swindon). The two E.E.s D6742/3 which have been on crew training since October, 1962, were returned to the E.R. on 22nd April. |
SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 |
Crewe Works (Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. |
SLS/196304 |