31/03/1949 |
Crewe Works |
During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
08/08/1959 |
Kentish Town MPD |
The allocation of Royal Scot Class engines is to be 46103/23/30/2/3/40/2/60. The original two are 46103/33 and at time of going to press 46123 was u/r at Edge Hill, 46103/32 u/r at Kentish Town and 46140 had not arrived yet. Six Britannias are still at Trafford Park. |
SLS/195910 |
08/01/1961 |
Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. |
SLS/196102 |
03/06/1961 |
Leeds-Birmingham-Bristol line |
With the advent of the Summer t.t. several steam workings have gone over to Type 4 Sulzers; whilst only 3 A3 Pacifics are left at Holbeck, Saltley has gained 3 class 6P and 11 Class 7P 4-6-0s viz., 45579, 45648/9, 45532/40, 46100/3/12/8/22/41/57/60/2. It is presumed that these latter will be utilised on Saturdays for the many extra trains which are run (and upon which 2-10-0s were utilised last year). |
SLS/196107 |
05/05/1962 |
Saltley MPD |
46106 Gordon Highlander lost its nameplates on 5th May and together with 46103 went on loan to Leicester Midland whilst 46118 went on loan to Leicester G.C.; 92167 (fitted mechanical stoker) is transferred to Tyne Dock whilst 92165/6 are expected to follow. They did in fact commence the journey on 22nd May but only got as far as Canklow where they were sent back to Saltley. |
SLS/196206 |
03/06/1962 |
Saltley MPD |
The following Royal Scots have been placed in store-46103/22/32/60 all ex Works; 46157/62; 46123 was under repair on 3rd June but was also scheduled for storage. |
SLS/196207 |