22/10/1949 |
Locomotive renumbering |
The re-numbering of the 'Patriot' Class was completed, with No. 45550 during W/E 22/10 and the '1900' Class (0-4-4T) was completed with No. 41900 during W/E 29/10. Of the forty-five original Midland 'Compound's,' thirty-three are still in service, and all except Nos. 1031/43 had been re-numbered by the middle of October. Apparently Tilbury 4-4-2T's Nos. 2120/21 have not yet been altered to 41938/39 although new engines with their numbers appeared in September; otherwise series 41928-78 is complete. At the end of October. one hundred and eighty-eight of the 'Jubilee's' (Nos. 45552-45742) had been re-numbered, leaving only Nos. 5552 an 5634 to be done. |
SLS/194912 |
08/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196111 |
15/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. |
SLS/196111 |
10/03/1963 |
Preston MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Preston on 10th March-42476/661, 45543/50, 49104/314/81/402/8/38/47/51. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Midland Miscellany (Stored) |
The new Water Orton station junction box-renamed Water Orton East Junction-was brought into use 12th May, 1963. Ketley Junc. was removed 12th May, 1963; it is now only possible to approach Ketley station via Lightmoor Junction. On 12th May, the collapse of Black Bridge (over the course of the old River Nene) at Stanground, Peterborough, closed the Peterborough East-March section and buses are now operating between Peterborough and Whittlesey. It is understood that the Ashbourne-Buxton line will not be available for passenger trains after Sunday, 26th May, when excursions ran from Hinckley to Tissington and Buxton, Alsager to Tissington and Buxton, Colne to Buxton and Ashbourne and Manchester (P) to Buxton and Ashbourne. The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963. |
SLS/196304 |