|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1958 | LMR regional adjustments | In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. | SLS/195802 |
26/11/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. | SLS/196201 |
10/03/1963 | Preston MPD (Stored) | Stored at Preston on 10th March-42476/661, 45543/50, 49104/314/81/402/8/38/47/51. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Midland Miscellany (Stored) | The new Water Orton station junction box-renamed Water Orton East Junction-was brought into use 12th May, 1963. Ketley Junc. was removed 12th May, 1963; it is now only possible to approach Ketley station via Lightmoor Junction. On 12th May, the collapse of Black Bridge (over the course of the old River Nene) at Stanground, Peterborough, closed the Peterborough East-March section and buses are now operating between Peterborough and Whittlesey. It is understood that the Ashbourne-Buxton line will not be available for passenger trains after Sunday, 26th May, when excursions ran from Hinckley to Tissington and Buxton, Alsager to Tissington and Buxton, Colne to Buxton and Ashbourne and Manchester (P) to Buxton and Ashbourne. The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963. |
SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5543, name: HOME GUARD Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
28/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45543 | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
09/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
15/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Preston (24K) | ||
17/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
31/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
05/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) | ||
02/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45543 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |