|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Crewe Works | The first three Caprotti Class '5's' of Order E.469 Nos. 44738-40 were completed on 16/4 (44738 ), 21/4 (44739 ) and 28/4 (44740 ). They are the first of ten Caprotti engines to be equipped with plain bearings. The latest 'Royal Scot' to undergo conversion was No. 6105 which was completed on 9/4, whilst the next two 'Patriot' 4-6-0's to be rebuilt are Nos. 5532 an 5512 (in that order). It is interesting to note that these two engines are to receive new frames, hitherto, of course, all converted 'Patriot' 4-6-0's have had their original frames modified. More ex L.N.W. withdrawn locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently. They were cut up as follows:-W/E 10/4 7946; W/E 17/4 6919, 7709, 25321; W/E 24/4 6728, 6926, 28153; W/E 1/5 9231, 9274, 25827; W/E 8/5 7821, 9250. Several ex W.D. 2-8-0 tenders recently arrived from Swindon. Four of them were fitted to ex L.M.S. 2-8-0's to replace the tenders sent to the Southern Region for use on the ex S.R. locomotives taking part in the exchange trials. Three ex S.R. boilers of the 4-4-0 'Schools' Class recently arrived here for repair, and it is understood that more are to follow. | SLS/194806 |
04/07/1948 | Crewe Works | Four more Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E469 Nos. 44743 , 44744 , 44745 and 44746 were completed on 3/6, 10/6, 21/6 and 29/6 respectively, while the remaining engine of that order (No. 44747) is already in an advanced state of completion. Two more 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0's have been rebuilt with taper boilers: No. 5532 completed on 16/6 and No. 5512 on 30/6. Nos. 5525/27 will be the next to be rebuilt, in that order. The frames for the first three '2P' 2-6-2T's of Order E470 were noted in the Erecting Shop on 1/7; the boiler, cab and tanks had already been fitted to No. 41210. The following withdrawn locomotives were noted in the carriage sheds:-Eastern shed Nos. 6679, 6747, 7700/96, 7812/41, 8910, 28097, 28230, 28350, 28367, 28415/41, 28542/86/97; Western shed Nos. 6653/89/91/92, 6870/78, 7840, 9273, 28234. Further ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap during the past month. They were cut-up as follows:-W/E 6/6 Nos. 7772, 7892, 7938, 9383; W/E 12/6 Nos. 6883, 6927, 25350; W/E 19/6 Nos. 6605/46, 6739; W/E 26/6 Nos. 6894, 9233, 28594; W/E 3/7 Nos. 7740, 25787. During the W/E 26/6, W.D. 2-10-0 No. 73799 North British (12A) was on Works undergoing a minor repair. It is understood that this engine is to be used for testing the new Locomotive Testing Plant at Rugby. Class '5' No. 44826 was re-converted to coal burning during W/E 26/6. Both Cornwall and Hardwicke have been hauled out of the Paint Shop and overhauled recently; the latter is now also lined out in accordance with ex L.N.W.R. practice. New construction here was as follows: North Shed No. 44744; Paint Shop Nos. 44745/46, 45532 (Rebuilt); Yard Nos. 45512 (Rebuilt), 41214/15 an 44757 (frames and cylinders); Erecting Shop Nos. 44747 (complete), 41210 (frame, cylinders, boiler and tanks), 41211 (frame, cylinders, tank and boiler (not mounted)), 41212 (frame, cylinders and boiler (not mounted)), 41213 (frame and cylinders), 5525 (being rebuilt), 5527 (for rebuilding); Heavy Machine Shop Nos. 41216-18 (frames and cylinders), 41219 (frame only). |
SLS/194808 |
04/07/1948 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop) | Four more Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E469 Nos. 44743 , 44744 , 44745 and 44746 were completed on 3/6, 10/6, 21/6 and 29/6 respectively, while the remaining engine of that order (No. 44747) is already in an advanced state of completion. Two more 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0's have been rebuilt with taper boilers: No. 5532 completed on 16/6 and No. 5512 on 30/6. Nos. 5525/27 will be the next to be rebuilt, in that order. The frames for the first three '2P' 2-6-2T's of Order E470 were noted in the Erecting Shop on 1/7; the boiler, cab and tanks had already been fitted to No. 41210. The following withdrawn locomotives were noted in the carriage sheds:-Eastern shed Nos. 6679, 6747, 7700/96, 7812/41, 8910, 28097, 28230, 28350, 28367, 28415/41, 28542/86/97; Western shed Nos. 6653/89/91/92, 6870/78, 7840, 9273, 28234. Further ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap during the past month. They were cut-up as follows:-W/E 6/6 Nos. 7772, 7892, 7938, 9383; W/E 12/6 Nos. 6883, 6927, 25350; W/E 19/6 Nos. 6605/46, 6739; W/E 26/6 Nos. 6894, 9233, 28594; W/E 3/7 Nos. 7740, 25787. During the W/E 26/6, W.D. 2-10-0 No. 73799 North British (12A) was on Works undergoing a minor repair. It is understood that this engine is to be used for testing the new Locomotive Testing Plant at Rugby. Class '5' No. 44826 was re-converted to coal burning during W/E 26/6. Both Cornwall and Hardwicke have been hauled out of the Paint Shop and overhauled recently; the latter is now also lined out in accordance with ex L.N.W.R. practice. New construction here was as follows: North Shed No. 44744; Paint Shop Nos. 44745/46, 45532 (Rebuilt); Yard Nos. 45512 (Rebuilt), 41214/15 an 44757 (frames and cylinders); Erecting Shop Nos. 44747 (complete), 41210 (frame, cylinders, boiler and tanks), 41211 (frame, cylinders, tank and boiler (not mounted)), 41212 (frame, cylinders and boiler (not mounted)), 41213 (frame and cylinders), 5525 (being rebuilt), 5527 (for rebuilding); Heavy Machine Shop Nos. 41216-18 (frames and cylinders), 41219 (frame only). |
SLS/194808 |
03/06/1961 | Leeds-Birmingham-Bristol line | With the advent of the Summer t.t. several steam workings have gone over to Type 4 Sulzers; whilst only 3 A3 Pacifics are left at Holbeck, Saltley has gained 3 class 6P and 11 Class 7P 4-6-0s viz., 45579, 45648/9, 45532/40, 46100/3/12/8/22/41/57/60/2. It is presumed that these latter will be utilised on Saturdays for the many extra trains which are run (and upon which 2-10-0s were utilised last year). | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1933 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6011, name: ILLUSTRIOUS Built at Crewe Works |
||
14/08/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5532 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
03/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45532 | ||
07/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
28/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
07/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
30/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
01/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45532 | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |