|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1955 | York MPD | 69369 (34E) mentioned in last month's notes, duly proceeded to Darlington (Bank Top), but was not accepted into North Road works. After returning to York, it spent a considerable time under repair in York shed before proceeding to Darnall (39B) on transfer. 'J25' 65650 an 65654 are now in store at York together with 62345. On 15th January, a Sheffield to Middlesbrough football excursion (M886) was worked throughout by 44855 (19A), which took water in York station platforms. On the same date 61028 (38C) was at York en route for Darlington works for repair. Other GC Section 'Bls' for Darlington works recently have included 61141 (38C), 61152 (39B) and 61328 (40B). 'Patriot' 45510 (5A) was an unusual visitor at York on 17th January. On 21st January, the 9.22 a.m. Leeds (City) to Scarborough was worked by 'B16/1' 61445 (50B) instead of the usual Holbeck Class 5, but 44853 (20A) worked the 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds (City). | SLS/195503 |
04/06/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. | SLS/196107 |
28/02/1962 | Lancaster Green Ayre MPD | Lancaster shed has acquired four unrebuilt Patriots (45505/7/10/8) to cover three turns previously performed by BR standard 4MTs which have been re-transferred to Springs Branch. Its Ivatt 2-6-0s (43007/52/112/3/5) have been transferred mainly to Nuneaton in exchange for Horwich moguls. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/08/1932 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6012 Built at Crewe Works |
||
25/06/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5510 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) | ||
26/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45510 | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
03/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
10/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
10/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) | ||
09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45510 | ||
30/08/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |