Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 564 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13970 Week
» 66986 Month
» 186513 Year
» 3213366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5985 |
on |
01/07/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
5503 |
on |
14/07/1934 |
British Railways |
45503 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Patriot |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 14/07/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/08/1961 |
Service Life |
29 yrs , 29 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,265,281 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1932 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5985 |
|
|
14/07/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5503 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45503 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45503 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|