|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1958 | LMR regional adjustments | In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. | SLS/195802 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/07/1932 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5959, name: ROYAL NAVAL DIVISION Built at Crewe Works |
||
28/05/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5502 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) | ||
20/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45502 | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
10/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
24/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
21/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Preston (24K) | ||
23/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
03/09/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45502 | ||
10/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |