Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 213 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17076 Week
» 8132 Month
» 354556 Year
» 3381409 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5738 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
British Railways |
45738 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
11/1936 |
SAMSON |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
27 yrs , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5738 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45738 |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45738 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|