Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1104 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18907 Week
» 71923 Month
» 191450 Year
» 3218303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5700 |
on |
20/04/1936 |
British Railways |
45700 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
20/04/1936 |
AMETHYST |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 20/04/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 04/07/1964 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1951 |
\"Jubilee\" class 45700 |
This engine, 45700, which lost its name Britannia when the standard Pacific was built early this year, has been named Amethyst to commemorate the exploit of the frigate which had to run the gauntlet of heavy fire during hit passage down the Yangtse Kiang during 1949. |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5700, name: AMETHYST Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45700 |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45700 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|