|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1961 | St. Rollox Works (Steam Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D3132, D3410, D3528, D5300/3/10/1, D6120/37. Works Yard : 42243, 45157, 45489/92, 57328, 57631, D6111. Steam Erecting Shop: 42690/3, 42804, 42913, 44724, 44820/98, 44920/55, 45047, 45118, 45687/96, 45727, 57617. Waiting Works : 42167, 42780, 44722. Ex-Works: D3279, 42882, 44954, 45083, 45126. | SLS/196108 |
14/04/1963 | Corkerhill MPD (stored) | in steam-45659, and stored-40615, 44323/30, 45673/7/87/92/3, 45727, 46102/4, 55203/21. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/02/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5687, name: NEPTUNE Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45687 | ||
16/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45687 | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |