|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1949 | Crewe Works | 21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' | SLS/194909 |
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/09/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5578, name: UNITED PROVINCES Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24136 |
||
08/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45578 | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
21/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
06/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
30/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45578 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |