31/10/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon and a 'Wick & Lybster' tank No. 15053 arrived at the Works on 12/10 and 19/10 respectively, both for attention to their boilers; 15053 still retains the H.R. building plates. Locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here during October 1948 (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) were as follows; - with 8' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' Nos. 40598 (3810) 12; 45017 (9530) 10; 45163 (9267) 26; 45309 (9719) 20; 45364 (9185) 4; 45463 (9725) 18; 45481 (9281) 31; 45485 (9831) 4; 45489 (9269) 7; 45583 (9030) 14; 45728 (9025) 22; - with 8' numerals and 8' 'British Railways' Nos. 41128 29; 42746 (4345) 13; 42832 (4167) 22; 42836 (4213) 20; 43883 (2976) 13; 43996 (3085) 27; 54457 (6041) 27; 54505 (6039) 15; 57344 (6014) 20; 57456 (1343) 25; 57697 (1873) 12; 57955 31; - with 8' numerals and 6' 'British Railways' Nos. 40150 15; 40185 28; 42209 31; 42400 6; 55124 11; 56169 13; - with 10' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' No. 54496 (6210) 13; - with 8' numerals and retaining L.M.S. on the tender No. 45053 (9127) 18. Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock and treated with a full paint schedule (tender number in brackets, followed by date to Varnish Shop) were as follows:-Nos. 57435 (1308) 30/9; 57581 (1662) 1/10; 56256 4/10; 56237 6/10; 57575 (6049) 11/10; 57622 (1703) 8/10; 56262 11/10; *55223 21/10; 57638 26/10; 57653 30/10; 56165 5/11. *Fully lined, as also was No. 55233, which was referred to last month. |
SLS/194812 |
03/12/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon was despatched on 19/11, still retaining L.M.S. on the tender (No. 2689), after having received attention to the boiler. Another interesting engine ex Works during the same week was 'Clan' goods, No. 57955. Both engines had been fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 15053 is still in the dump, while the boiler is undergoing repair. The inner firebox is being almost renewed by getting new tube and door plates, and new half sides. The engine is soon to enter the shops for a general repair. A further ex H.R. engine to come in for service repair was No. 17698 (30A), which arrived on 4/11 and was despatched on 25/11. No. 5716 is still in the shops, having been brought in from the dump on 12/10. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined are:-Nos. 55145 an 55231. |
SLS/194901 |
30/06/1949 |
Highland Section |
The few ex H.R.locomotives, now less than twenty, are not nowadays (apart from the 'Barney's' at Corkerhill) often seen south of Inverness or Forres. The one remaining 'Clan,' No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon, and the surviving 'Clan goods' put in most of their time on freight work on the 'Far North' road. Forres has the last 'Loch,' No. 14385, and a small 'Ben,' No. 14410. Another of the latter, No. 14409, does pilot work and odd jobs at Helmsdale, whilst the remaining three, Nos. 14398, 14399 an 54404, are at Wick and Thurso. The two small 0-4-4T's, Nos. 55051 an 55053, have both recently been repainted, with 'British Railways' on the tank sides. These work a week at a time on the Dornoch branch, the 'spare' engine being found at Helmsdale. 'Clan goods' No. 57955 has also been repainted. with 'British Railways' on the tender sides, as also have the 'Barney's,' Nos. 57695 an 57698, but the other renumbered locomotives, Nos. 54404, 54767, 57954 an 57956, are still lettered 'L.M.S.' Local traffic around Inverness is now handled by ex C.R. 4-4-0's, of which Nos. 14439, 54455/63/66/70/71, 14472, 54473/80/81, 14482, 54484, 14487, 54488/91, 14493/95 an 54496 are allocated to Inverness, Forres, Dingwall, etc. No. 54471 was noted at Dingwall, while No. 14472 was working the Black Isle branch train. Dunrobin has been sold, and it is understood to be destined for New Romney, Kent, although for what purpose is not known. |
SLS/194908 |
06/07/1949 |
Inverness MPD |
On 6/7 No. 57955 was on the shed, whilst No. 57956 worked out to the north. On the same day, No. 57954 was at Helmsdale and Nos. 57950/51 were on the Kyle of Lochalsh line. The last 'Clan,' No. 54767, worked in from Tain and the following day worked to Kyle of Lochalsh. |
SLS/194909 |
30/04/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. |
SLS/195006 |
30/06/1950 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Engines into shops: 44707, 44799. 'Clan Goods' 57955 left the works without being fully painted or lined. |
SLS/195008 |