Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3501 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16907 Week
» 69923 Month
» 189450 Year
» 3216303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5496 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
British Railways |
45496 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
153 |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/06/1964 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/02/1963 |
Glasgow St. Rollox (Ex-Works) |
Erecting Shop. 42271, 42800/3, 44923/57, 45423/56/60/78/99, D3730/8, D3916, D5337/69, D5121/3, D6105/23/4/31, Test House: D3280, D6103. Paint Shop-stored: D6101/6/22/5/7/30. Ex-Works: 45357/62, 45496. Awaiting Works: 42195, 44980, D6100 fire damage, D6107/14. Works shunters. D2772, D3542. D6123 was being prepared for Paxman Works, Colchester. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5496 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A) |
|
|
31/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (28A) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (31A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (28A) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45496 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
08/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45496 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|