31/05/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed |
SLS/194807 |
28/02/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. |
SLS/195004 |
15/11/1963 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). |
SLS/196312 |
16/12/1963 |
Crewe Works (Outside) |
Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. |
SLS/196401 |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |